MA S601 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to pharmacy benefit managers. Financial Services.
Title
Prohibiting self-dealing by pharmacy benefit managers and pharmacies under common ownership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S807 (Similar To) 2023-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2492 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Read second
S2499 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Bills in the Third Reading report, substituting a new draft S2520, accepted
S2520 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2492 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Read second
S2499 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Bills in the Third Reading report, substituting a new draft S2520, accepted
S2520 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S601 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S601.pdf |