MA S601 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2535
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation establishing a commission relative to group purchasing of health insurance for private sector human service workers. Health Care Financing.
Title
Establishing a commission relative to group purchasing of health insurance for private sector human service workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2535 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S511 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied H581
S1418 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 422 of the Acts of 2018
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1406 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1407 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1449 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied S1479
H1025 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3152 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2202 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
S1418 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 422 of the Acts of 2018
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1406 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1407 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1449 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied S1479
H1025 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3152 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2202 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S601 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S601.pdf |