MA S1406 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a group insurance commission under the Executive Office of Administration and Finance. Public Service.
Title
Regarding the group insurance commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2491 |
2017-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S197 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
H3138 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H2675 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1876 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S197 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
H3138 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H2675 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1876 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1406 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1406.pdf |