MA S1407 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2491

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to Group Insurance Commission premium contributions. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Group Insurance Commission premium contributions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2491
2017-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1448 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1336 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1352 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4259
H2568 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback