MA S579 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2650
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to set NDMA levels. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to setting NDMA levels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2650 |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S1683 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2931
S461 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S526 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4246 (Similar To) 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2024
S2650 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1683 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2931
S461 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S526 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4246 (Similar To) 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2024
S2650 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S579 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S579.pdf |