MA S568 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fraternal benefit societies. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to fraternal benefit societies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1070 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
S879 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1575 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2952 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2230 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
S879 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1575 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2952 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2230 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S568 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S568.pdf |