MA S55 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to equitable allocation of cannabis revenue. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to equitable allocation of cannabis revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Miranda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2635 |
2023-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1435 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
S1263 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S982 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
H1992 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3600 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2635 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1263 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S982 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
H1992 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3600 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2635 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S55 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S55.pdf |