MA S1263 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2642
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the safe use of psilocybin. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Regulating the safe use of psilocybin
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2642 |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S2642 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1263 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1263.pdf |