MA S537 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to waste removal plans for transfer stations. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to waste removal plans for transfer stations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H811 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H759 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H745 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H2755 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H743 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H798 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
H759 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H745 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H2755 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H743 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H798 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S537 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S537.pdf |