MA H745 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reducing paper and packaging waste in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing paper and packaging waste in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H743 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H811 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Senate concurred
H759 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S498 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S492 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback