MA H1330 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S982

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to violations for passing a stopped or stationary waste or recycling collection vehicle on a public way. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to speed limitations near waste or recycling collection vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-10HouseRules suspended
2020-02-10HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-06HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-02-06HouseAccompanied by S982
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1112 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1091 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H3056 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S982 (Replaces) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1330

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback