MA H1112 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5160

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit motor vehicle insurance surcharges for inspection violations. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to moving vehicle violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-01HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5160
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H973 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4643
H1047 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback