MA S529 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the re-use of soil for large reclamation projects. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the re-use of soil for large reclamation projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2540 |
2019-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S386 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S517 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
S2404 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S517 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
S2404 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S529 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S529.pdf |