MA S502 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2626

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to reducing food insecurity. Environment and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to reducing food insecurity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2626
2023-04-27JointHearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-04-18HouseHouse concurred
2023-04-13SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Agriculture
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

S2626 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback