MA S494 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce disposable plastic straw waste. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To combat disposable plastic straw waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied by S572, H989 and H998 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1296 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H690 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2315 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S231 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S177 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S1370 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2263
S197 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S572 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H989 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H998 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H2354 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied S1445
H690 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2315 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S231 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S177 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S1370 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2263
S197 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S572 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H989 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H998 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H2354 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied S1445
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S494 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S494.pdf |