MA S490 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2489

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit wild and exotic animal performances. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to wild and exotic animal performance prohibtion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2489
2017-04-25JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S349 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S489 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2387
S882 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S461 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2461
S460 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1127 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
S1145 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2285
H441 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4050
H852 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2454 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H844 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2933 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Accompanied S459
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback