MA S460 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent animal suffering by irresponsible breeding practices. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To prevent animal suffering by irresponsible breeding practices
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2489 |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S466 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3443 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1080 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1232 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1831 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2728 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H4266 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3443 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1080 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1232 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1831 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2728 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H4266 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S460 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S460.pdf |