MA S461 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2461
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the supervision of animals at day care services. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Requiring the supervision of animals at day care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2461 |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1127 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
S489 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2387
S459 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1084 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2454 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H2426 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
H844 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H416 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2461 (Replaced by) 2018-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S489 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2387
S459 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1084 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2454 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H2426 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
H844 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H416 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2461 (Replaced by) 2018-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S461.pdf |