MA S439 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-29 - Accompanied H743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-29 - Accompanied H743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Sustainable Food Service Ware Act. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To reduce plastic packaging waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | House | Accompanied H743 |
2019-04-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2772 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1834 (Similar To) 2020-07-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H771 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
H857 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S462 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H859 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H743 (Replaced by) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4084 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S1834 (Similar To) 2020-07-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H771 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
H857 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S462 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H859 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H743 (Replaced by) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4084 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S439 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S439.pdf |