MA S436 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation concerning bilingual ballots. Election Laws.
Title
An act concerning ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3828 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - New draft substituted, see H4793
S477 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H831 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S486 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H766 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H776 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S437 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H796 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4793 (Similar To) 2022-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 282 of the Acts of 2022
S477 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H831 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S486 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H766 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H776 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S437 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H796 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4793 (Similar To) 2022-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 282 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S436.pdf |