MA S425 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4780
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote innovation in eldercare services. Elder Affairs.
Title
Promoting innovation in eldercare services
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4780 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 16, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2911 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H2336 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5199
S1552 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2970
H2257 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5196
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2970 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2336 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5199
S1552 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2970
H2257 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5196
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2970 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S425 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S425.pdf |