MA S390 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide funding for clean energy and energy efficiency measures for the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing funding for clean energy and energy efficiency measures for the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S390 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S390.pdf |