MA S389 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Recommitted to the committee on Election Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure municipal participation of the widest eligible range. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring municipal participation of the widest eligible range

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateRecommitted to the committee on Election Laws
2020-02-24SenateRules suspended
2020-02-24SenateOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2020-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S382 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H707 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S420 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H692 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H635 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H643 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback