MA S381 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2399
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fair elections. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to fair elections
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2399 |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S24 (Similar To) 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2017
S101 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S454 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S890 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1422 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S417 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H227 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H3711 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 247 of the Acts of 2018
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S575 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H404 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
S2156 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1147 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
H3825 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4006 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2245 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2018
H4163 (Similar To) 2018-09-10 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S2407 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2536
H4402 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4709
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H5025 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Passed to be engrossed
S101 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S454 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S890 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1422 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S417 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H227 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H3711 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 247 of the Acts of 2018
H1483 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S575 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H404 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
S2156 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1147 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
H3825 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4006 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2245 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2018
H4163 (Similar To) 2018-09-10 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S2407 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2536
H4402 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4709
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H5025 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S381 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S381.pdf |