MA H5025 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3863). December 28, 2018.
Title
Authorizing the town of Athol to establish a special fund for the town of Athol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-28 | House | Substituted for H3863 |
Same As/Similar To
H3863 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5025
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5025 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5025.pdf |