MA S380 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2399

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide a local option for ranked choice voting in city or town elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a local option for ranked choice voting in city or town elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2399
2017-10-04JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S381 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S366 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S395 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S402 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1623 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2101 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2069 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
H372 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3486 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H375 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H360 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H687 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4743
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S2589 (Similar To) 2018-12-03 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
S2658 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
H4981 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback