MA S377 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2399

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to election officers. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to election officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2399
2017-05-05JointHearing scheduled for 05/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S398 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S389 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H3656 (Similar To) 2017-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2017
H376 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2069 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S2658 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
H4981 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback