MA S343 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2665

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to school safety and security. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to school safety and security

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2665
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H1562 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2018 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S329 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S295 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S338 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2665
S2665 (Replaced by) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback