MA S329 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2538

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to student safety in interscholastic athletic activities. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to student safety in interscholastic athletic activities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2538
2019-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H408 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback