MA S311 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2349
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote global trade and economic development through biliteracy. Education.
Title
To promote global trade and economic development through biliteracy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2349 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S669 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H644 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H285 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2045 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3616 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2349 (Replaced by) 2018-04-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H644 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H285 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2045 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3616 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2349 (Replaced by) 2018-04-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S311 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S311.pdf |