MA H644 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4610

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide high school graduates equal access to in-state tuition rates and financial aid in the higher education system. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to equal opportunity for high school graduates in the commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4610
2017-05-30JointHearing scheduled for 06/15/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S112 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H635 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S668 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S692 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2469
H1622 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H647 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S311 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
S707 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S2155 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H4610 (Replaced by) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback