MA S3004 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to lease the former Joseph Lee Pool Complex located in the city of Boston
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to lease the former Joseph Lee Pool Complex located in the city of Boston
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #243 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #243 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-31 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY, No. 274) |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-30 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-30 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H5144) pending |
2022-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-18 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Substituted for S2041 |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2041 |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H5049 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2022
S3029 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2022
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
H5096 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2041 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - New draft substituted, see S3004
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
H5045 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2022
H5049 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2022
S3029 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2022
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
H5096 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2041 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - New draft substituted, see S3004
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3004 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3004.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall243.pdf |