MA S2960 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2965
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2965
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2965
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michael D'Ambra, an employee of the Worcester County Sheriff's Office. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michael D'Ambra, an employee of the Worcester County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2965 |
2022-06-27 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2965 (Replaced by) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2022
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S15 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
H3875 (Similar To) 2021-07-22 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S15 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
H3875 (Similar To) 2021-07-22 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2960 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2960.pdf |