MA S2780 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to release its interest by deed or to grant an easement in a certain parcel of land in the City of Fall River
Title
Authorizing the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to release its interest by deed or to grant an easement in a certain parcel of land in the City of Fall River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Senate concurs in the House amendment |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-30 | House | Rule suspended |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-29 | House | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted |
2020-07-29 | House | Read second |
2020-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending |
2020-07-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendments pending |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4914 |
2020-06-30 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2472 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2472 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from the committee in Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2780 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2780.pdf |