MA S2717 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to hospital grade breast pumps. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to hospital grade breast pumps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied by H1215 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/15/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-02-24 | House | House concurred |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H1215 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S2717
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2717 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2717.pdf |