MA S269 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2428
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect student privacy. Education.
Title
Protecting student privacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2428 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S259 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2429
S262 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S296 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S230 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1172 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S315 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S991 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2320
H1154 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S327 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3733 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1132 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2486 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1480 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4214
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2096 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3654
S2266 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2428 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S262 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2366
S296 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S230 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S264 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1172 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S315 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S991 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2320
H1154 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S327 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3733 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1132 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2486 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1480 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4214
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2096 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3654
S2266 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2428 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S269 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S269.pdf |