MA H3733 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of defibrillators for high school graduation. Education.
Title
Requiring instruction in CPR and the use of defibrillators for high school graduation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4396 |
2017-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H347 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3479 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H2278 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H260 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H2844 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H4396 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3479 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H2278 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H260 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H2844 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H4396 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3733 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3733.pdf |