MA S2581 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Andover to convert a certain parcel of land from school purposes to general municipal purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Andover to convert a certain parcel of land for general municipal purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2024 from 04:00 PM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-02-05 | House | House concurred |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
S2692 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2784 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2819 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2784 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2819 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2024 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2581 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2581.pdf |