MA S2578 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Joseph Filardi, an employee of the Department of Revenue. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Joseph Filardi, an employee of the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2021-11-10 | House | House concurred |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2775 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2775 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2578 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2578.pdf |