MA S2571 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent domestic violence. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent domestic violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseHouse concurred
2020-03-24SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-23SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday, May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-26HouseHouse concurred
2019-06-13SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2019-06-13SenateRules suspended
2019-05-06SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback