MA S256 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2112
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote mental health education in Massachusetts high schools. Education.
Title
Relative to the promotion of mental health education in Massachusetts high schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2112 |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read second |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the day for Thursday, July 20, 2017 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2112 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-04-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S547 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S524 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1108 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
S1088 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2269 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H945 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2408 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S2112 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S547 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S524 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1108 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
S1088 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2269 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H945 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2408 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S2112 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S256 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S256.pdf |