MA S2551 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2734
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to empower towns and cities to protect residents and the environment from harmful pesticides. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Empowering towns and cities to protect residents and the environment from harmful pesticides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2734 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-12 | House | House concurred |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H910 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S565 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S528 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S565 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S528 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2551 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2551.pdf |