MA S2523 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the town charter for the town of Southbridge. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the town charter for the town of Southbridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-12-11 | House | House concurred |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
H3997 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2024
H4086 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4509 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3997 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2024
H4086 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4509 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2523 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2523.pdf |