MA S2513 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to elder protection. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to elder protection
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Elder Affairs |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2018-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2018 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate receded from its reference to Health Care Financing and concurred in the reference to Elder Affairs |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-05-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
2018-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-07 | House | Question divided |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H2467 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4835 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Section returned with veto (see section 6) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H2467 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4835 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Section returned with veto (see section 6) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2513 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2513.pdf |