MA S2512 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the city of Northampton to release a certain conservation easement. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Northampton to release a certain conservation easement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-25 - House - House On Enactment Land taking Yea and Nay No. 416 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-25 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #469 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2018
2018-07-25SenateLaid before the Governor
2018-07-25SenateEnacted -see Roll Call #469 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0)
2018-07-25HouseEnacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 416)
2018-07-25HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-25HouseRules suspended
2018-07-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-24HouseRules suspended
2018-07-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-07-23HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-07-23SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-23SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-06-07SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-05-17SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-05-09HouseHouse concurred
2018-05-07SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4774 (Similar To) 2018-08-20 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback