MA H4774 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the exchange of certain parcels of land between the city of Northampton and the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relating to land in Northampton for affordable housing
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] | Sen. James Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-08-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday September 17, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-07-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2018-07-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S731 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H660 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S731 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H660 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4774.pdf |