MA S251 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to circuit breaker reimbursement. Education.
Title
Relative to circuit breaker reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H138 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H512 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H2834 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2418 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H793 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H138 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H512 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H2834 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2418 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H793 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S251 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S251.pdf |