MA H138 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the rate of reimbursement for certain human services providers. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fair pay for comparable work

Sponsors

Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H405 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1191 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback