MA S2500 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2788
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2788
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Berkley to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Berkley to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2788 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday December 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-22 | House | House concurred |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2477 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2022
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H3741 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3897
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S2501 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2587
S2506 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2504 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
H343 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2788 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2022
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H3741 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3897
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S2501 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2587
S2506 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2504 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
H343 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2788 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2500.pdf |