MA S2788 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2500
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Berkley to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2788).
Title
Authorizing the town of Berkley to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Rep. Norman Orrall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-06-13 | House | Enacted |
2022-06-09 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-05-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-04 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-03-17 | Senate | New draft of S2500 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2500 (Replaces) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2788
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2477 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2022
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S227 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2477 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2022
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2788 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2788.pdf |